THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:42:53 AM
Taylor, John Robert
CPSO#:
19115
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
1559 Carletta Drive, Mississauga, ON L4X 1E2
Date Received: 12 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jan 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |