THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:36:07 AM
Murray, Shirley Benaim
CPSO#:
19050
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
147 Farnham Ave
Toronto ON M4V 1H7
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Nov 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:24 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHIRLEY BENAIM MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1961 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jul 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 May 1964 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2023 |