THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:02:14 AM
Holt, Ann Renee Elizabeth
CPSO#:
18911
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Apr 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Nov 1963
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 1960 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1961 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jul 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Apr 2002 |