THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:51:21 AM
Horn, Andrew Aitkenhead
CPSO#:
18883
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Nov 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:15 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 1957 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jul 1960 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 1963 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 16 Nov 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jul 1999 |