THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:32:11 AM
Murray, Timothy Macleod
CPSO#:
18871
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jul 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1) Patients that saw Dr. Murray at the Metabolic Bone Clinic at St. Michael's Hospital at
61 Queen Street East may contact the Hospital Record Room.
2) Patients that saw Dr. Murray at his private office at 38 Shuter Street may contact:
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 03 Mar 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Mar 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1963 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Oct 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2006 |