THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:40:24 AM
Davidson, Murray
CPSO#:
18851
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Nov 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Records Management Ltd, 13-1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3
Date Received: 27 Feb 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1967 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1961 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2019 |