THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:16:51 PM
Benoit, Brien Georges
CPSO#:
18752
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 1963
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 1965
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
129 Helena Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 3N3
Phone: (613) 729-6587
Fax: (613) 729-6587
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Brien Benoit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:15 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIEN GEORGES BENOIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENOIT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jul 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1965 |