THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:57:11 AM
Finn, William Percy
CPSO#:
18629
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
16 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Apr 1963
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: W. P. Finn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 16 Dec 2020 |