THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:28:40 AM
Adams, Barrett Robert
CPSO#:
18562
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jan 1963
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
27-Sep-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Gravelle
Smyth Medical Centre
Suite 220
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa, ON K1G 4G3
Telephone: 613-737-7707
Date Received: 21 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Nov 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 1963 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |