THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:32:30 PM
Huschiltt, Peter Nikolaus
CPSO#:
18552
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Dec 1962
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Nov 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 1962 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: April 15, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Peter Nikolaus Huschiltt, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, Dr. Peter Nikolaus Huschiltt:
(2)Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of professional
misconduct to the Discipline Committee by way of a Notice of Hearing dated January 12, 2010.
(4) Hereby resign from the College effective April 15, 2011 (the “Effective Date”).
(5) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for a certificate of registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(6) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have either applied, re-applied for registration as a physician in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing,
(12) Consent to the terms of this Undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.