THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:13:48 AM
Bacon, Thomas Nicholas
CPSO#:
18326
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
15 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 1962
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1962 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 15 Jun 2000 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 May 2000
Summary:
On May 26, 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bacon guilty of professional misconduct for failing to maintain the standards of the profession and incompetence. Subsequently, the committee ordered that the Registrar is directed to revoke the certificate of registration effective June 15, 2000.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 24, 2000