THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:22:25 AM
Jeney, Piroska
CPSO#:
18173
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Oct 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: University of Sciences,Budapest, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Mar 1959 to 30 Jun 1960
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1960 to 01 Jul 1961
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 1962 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |