THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:43:45 PM
Brawley, Gerald Peter
CPSO#:
17938
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
05 Sep 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 21 May 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1967 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 27 Jun 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Dec 1994 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 05 Sep 1995 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Sep 1995
Summary:
In September 1995, Dr. Brawley pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 26(28) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. He also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Brawley's plea of guilty to these charges and found him guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Brawley be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, that he be fined the sum of $5000.00, and that his licence to practice medicine be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 05, 1995