THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:10:30 AM
Ogilvie, Richard Ian
CPSO#:
17905
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Mar 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst
Toronto, ON M5T 258
Date Received: 08 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Nov 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |