THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:19:53 PM
Medline, Norton Millard
CPSO#:
17893
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
10 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
10-Aug-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: N. Medline Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:28 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:09 Apr 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1960 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1961 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 10 Aug 2020 |