THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:28:07 AM
Sloan, Ian Alexander Jeremy
CPSO#:
17736
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Nov 1960
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sloan, Ian Alexander (used until: 31 Mar 2004 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jeremy Sloan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Headache and Pain Relief Clinic
Suite 220
251 Consumers Road
Toronto ON M2J 4R3
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Dec 1960 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1960 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |