Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Jul 2003
Summary:
On July 24, 2003, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Moore(s plea and found that he committed acts of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with patients. The Committee ordered that Dr. Moore be reprimanded and that within 7 days of the order.
Dr. Moore executed an undertaking dated July 24, 2003, as follows:
I, Peter Cameron Forrester Moore, hereby resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
I promise not to apply for registration or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.
I consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered in the register as information that is available to the public.
I have obtained legal advice before giving this undertaking.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 24, 2003
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jun 1998
Summary:
In July 1998, Dr. Moore pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct in that he has committed sexual impropiety with a patient. The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Moore(s plea, by way of Agreed Statement of Facts and Consent Disposition, and found him guilty of professional misconduct.
The Discipline Committee accepted the Statement of Agreed Facts and Consent Disposition and ordered the following penalty:
Dr. Moore to appear before this Committee to be reprimanded and directs that the fact of the reprimand be recorded in the register.
That the imposition of any further penalty is suspended upon the following terms:
(1) Dr. Moore will continue in psychotherapy with a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar.
(2) Dr. Moore will instruct his treating psychiatrist, and Dr. Moore(s treating psychiatrist will indicate his or her agreement in writing to the College, to notify the Registrar of the College in the event that he or she identifies any change in Dr. Moore(s condition which gives him or her cause for concern that Dr. Moore(s patients might be at risk.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 06, 1998
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Feb 1991
Summary:
In February 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Moore guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Moore be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ordered that Dr. Moore(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of two years. The suspension itself would be suspended at the end of two months, provided that Dr. Moore(s therapist or a supervisor acceptable to the Registrar provided quarterly reports, satisfactory to the Registrar. These reports were to be provided on an ongoing basis, until the psychotherapy and the supervision were concluded to the satisfaction of the Registrar.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 21 Feb 1991