THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:17:04 PM
Sillers, Donald Ellwood
CPSO#:
17195
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 1959
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
28-Jul-2015
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Requests for medical records should be directed to Dr. Larissa Derzko-Dzulynsky's Office located at:
Suite 215
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto, ON
M6S 4W4
Tel: (416) 760-8763
Date Received: 09 Jul 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:01 Jan 1963 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1959 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2008 |