THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:49:26 PM
Davidson, Alan Stuart
CPSO#:
16710
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
22 Nov 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Nov 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1958 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1996 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1996 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee |
Effective: 26 Nov 1996 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 22 Nov 2000 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 02 Apr 1996
Summary:
On April 2, 1995, a panel of the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Alan Stuart Davidson to be an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario as defined in subsection 1 (1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991. Pursuant to that finding, on November 26, 1996, a panel of the Fitness to Practise Committee made an order to suspend Dr. Davidson's certificate of registration for a minimum of one year and indefinitely thereafter or until Dr. Davidson meets the conditions which the Fitness to Practise Committee ordered to be imposed on his certificate of registration. The suspension of Dr. Davidson's certificate of registration began on November 26, 1996.
Dr. Davidson has appealed from the decision of the Fitness to Practise Committee to the Divisional Court. The order of the Fitness to Practise Committee to suspend and impose conditions on Dr. Davidson's certificate of registration takes effect notwithstanding the appeal.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 20 Nov 1995