THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:21:11 AM
Cameron, Hugh Charles
CPSO#:
16639
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Nov 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1954
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Nov 1959 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1958 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Nov 1995 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Jan 1994
Summary:
In June 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cameron guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 26(28) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Cameron be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months. The Committee further ruled that a condition be placed on Dr. Cameron's licence, such that he be required to continue to receive treatment from a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar, at intervals and for such a period as deemed appropriate by the treating psychiatrist and the Registrar. Dr. Cameron's licence was also to be subject to the further condition that he permit the treating psychiatrist to submit reports to the Registrar at six-month intervals, indicating Dr. Cameron's compliance with the requirement that he continue to receive treatment. This treating psychiatrist was to be in a position to provide assurance to the Registrar that Dr. Cameron's condition was such that the public was safe from any breaches of the physician-patient fiduciary relationship. The Committee stipulated that failure to comply with any of the conditions set out in the penalty would result in the immediate revocation of Dr. Cameron's licence.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): Sep 08, 1992