THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:18:15 PM
Farber, Earl Pelig
CPSO#:
16520
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Oct 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:15 Mar 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:29 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1957 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1962 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1964 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2002 |