THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:45:59 AM
Birse, Sheila Hamilton
CPSO#:
16418
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
14 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Apr 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1952
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:14 Nov 1960 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1957 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Aug 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 1999 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2009 |