THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:18:19 AM
Butler, Pieter Ormonde Gordon
CPSO#:
16216
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1948
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Nov 1961 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1957 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2007 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: November 15, 2007
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Pieter Ormonde Gordon Butler to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the "College"). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College's Registration Department): 1. I, Dr. Pieter Ormonde Gordon Butler, hereby resign from the College effective November 15, 2007. 2. I undertake that I will not apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 4. I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated December 6, 2006, for disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. 5. I agree that, in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated December 6, 2006.