THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:10:02 AM
Giblon, Barnett Israel
CPSO#:
16200
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
31 May 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jul 1957
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1974 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1957 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2006 |
Concerns
Source:
Executive Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2006
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On April 10, 2006, Dr. Barnett Israel Giblon gave an undertaking to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to resign from Membership
in theCollege effective May 31, 2006, and to not apply for Registration
as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or in any
other jurisdiction worldwide.