THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:31:44 PM
Deck, John Henry Northcote
CPSO#:
15806
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Oct 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:29 Nov 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neuropathology |
Effective:17 Nov 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1956 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Oct 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2010 |