THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:56:32 AM
Weinberg, Victor
CPSO#:
15718
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jul 1956
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jan 1956 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1956 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2000 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Feb 1988
Summary:
In February 1988, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Weinberg guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Weinberg be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 09 Dec 1987