THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:38:06 PM
Patt, Norman Leon
CPSO#:
15413
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Sep 1955
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1955
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr Norm Patt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King St E
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Tel: 905-721-4300
Date Received: 17 Jul 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1962 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1955 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2018 |