THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:05:16 AM
Senn, John Sloan
CPSO#:
15021
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Oct 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
12-Aug-2006
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 1958 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 1955 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1997 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2004 |