THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:31:02 AM
Bak, Zonko
CPSO#:
14783
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Nov 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Oct 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: University of Toronto, 1954
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1960 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1954 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 20 Sep 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Nov 2000 |