THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:57:36 PM
Quirk, Keith Castle
CPSO#:
14263
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
11-Oct-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1952
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
J.E.Y's Business Records Storage 871 Jet Avenue P1B 2W9
Tel: 705-494-7575
Fax: 705-494-7428
Date Received: 07 Jun 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:24 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1953 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |