THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:50:32 PM
Burkholder, Joseph Norman
CPSO#:
14256
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1953 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1959 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 1960 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jan 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 May 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1994 |