THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:18:46 PM
Johnston, Ronald Elmer
CPSO#:
13664
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Dec 1951
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
11-Apr-2016
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Dr. Johnston's former secretary can be reached at 905-378-4647 ext. 49464 to access files
Files for Dr. Johnston have been stored at:
Niagara Health System - St. Catherine’s Site
Out-Patient Mental Health
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catherine’s, ON
L0S 0A9
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Nov 1956 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1951 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2013 |