THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:05:43 AM
Sestier, Maude
CPSO#:
133341
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Aug 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
205-385 Wilson St E
Ancaster ON L9G 2C1
Phone: 12899488524
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences (Administrative Office) |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:15 Sep 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAUDE SESTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SESTIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Dec 2022
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2021 |