THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:21:14 AM
Davis, George Edwin Donald
CPSO#:
13060
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jul 1950
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
18-Oct-2014
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1950
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1956 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1950 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2000 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 14 Feb 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Dec 2010 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Oct 2000
Summary:
On October 23, 2000, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Davis( plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice which related to two charges of defrauding OHIP.
The Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
1) That Dr. Davis be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register,
2) That the Registrar suspend Dr. Davis( certificate of registration for a period of three months, starting as of November 15, 2000, and ending as of February 14, 2001;
3) Dr. Davis is ordered to pay costs in the amount of $2,500.00 before November 15, 2000
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 23, 2000