THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:14:06 AM
Ziter, Michael Joseph
CPSO#:
12724
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Sep 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: St. Joseph's University, 1947
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 1948 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1995 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2011 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Sep 1982
Summary:
In September 1982, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ziter guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Ziter be reprimanded, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of thirty days.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 13 Sep 1982