THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 17:26:55 PM
Chavarria Viquez, Jorge Andres
CPSO#:
122910
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Clinical Fellow)
as of
28 Oct 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Costa Rica, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 28 Oct 2020 to 07 Dec 2020
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 08 Dec 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2023 |