THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:16:21 PM
Shin, John Junwon
CPSO#:
122225
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Apr 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2020
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main St W
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75166
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jan 2022
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Jan 2023
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jan 2024
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2024 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2024 |
|
Active |