THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:44:20 AM
Nadler, Brian Jacob
CPSO#:
120501
MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of
31 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Internal Medicine (hospitalist prac
2E
Phone: 6136321111
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2020 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Feb 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2021 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Registration Status: Suspended
Effective From: 31 Mar 2021
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 31 Mar 2021 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: July 16, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS
On July 5, 2021, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Brian Nadler:
1. Reside at an address approved by surety.
2. Notify the specified Officer in Charge (or designate) at Hawkesbury OPP of your address in writing within 24 hours of your release.
3. Notify the specified Officer in Charge (or designate) at Hawkesbury OPP of any change in your address.
4. Remain in Canada.
5. Do not associate or communicate in any way, either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with a) employees of Hawkesbury General Hospital and b) patients and relatives treated at Hawkesbury General Hospital except in the presence of counsel for the purpose of preparing a defence.
6. Do not practice medicine.
Source:
Other
Active Date: March 26, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES
Brian Jacobs Nadler was charged with the following offences:
1. Four counts of First Degree Murder, on or about March 25, 2021, contrary to Section 231(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of charge: March 26, 2021 and August 11, 2022; Indictment May 25, 2023
Place of charge: Hawkesbury, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police