THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:56:10 PM
Chanana, Ajay
CPSO#:
119936
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King's College London GKT School, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
105-400 Adelaide St E
The S&Y Clinic
Toronto ON M5A 4S3
Phone: 647-509-8792
Fax: 855-953-3580
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Oct 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AJAY CHANANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANANA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Sep 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2020 |