THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:58:27 AM
Ludwig, Bernard Lionel
CPSO#:
11873
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jan 1946
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
16-Sep-2012
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1945
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Blue Water Imaging
Tel: 416-781-2050
Date Received: 19 Feb 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jan 1951 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1946 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2007 |