THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:49:42 PM
Shusterman, Morris
CPSO#:
11750
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 May 1945
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
26-Dec-2012
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1945
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 22 Sep 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:07 Dec 1955 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 1945 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2008 |