THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:40:03 AM
Kwok, Timothy Shun Him
CPSO#:
115034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2018
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY SHUN HIM KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2022 |