THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:20:43 AM
Douglas, John Hugh Cameron
CPSO#:
11502
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1943
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1951 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 1944 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Oct 1947 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1948 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 May 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 May 1989 |