THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:16:12 AM
Spicer, Drew Marie
CPSO#:
114781
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:10 Oct 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DREW MARIE SPICER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPICER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2019 |