THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:52:22 PM
Moini, Maryam
CPSO#:
114737
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Shiraz University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
737 Parkdale Ave
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Ottawa ON K1Y 1J8
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 18975
Fax: 613-739-6868
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:01 Jul 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 16 Sep 2018
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2024 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2029 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2024 |
|
Active |