THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:00:39 PM
Salituri, Jessica Marie
CPSO#:
114309
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-11 Lakeside Terr
Barrie ON L4M 0H9
Phone: 7058819810
Fax: 7059153500
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA MARIE SALITURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALITURI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2018 to 08 Apr 2018
EL - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 04 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
EL - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2020 |