THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:31:55 AM
Arakgi, Michelle Elizabeth
CPSO#:
114142
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main St W
4E Department of Surgery
McMaster Hospital
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: 905-521-9992
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ELIZABETH ARAKGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARAKGI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Nov 2017 to 08 Dec 2017
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Jul 2019 to 11 Jun 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Sep 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2021 to 04 May 2021
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |