THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:50:49 AM
Murtha, Luke William
CPSO#:
112592
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
29 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education (Elective)
as of
18 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Limerick School of Medicin, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 18 Jul 2022 to 29 Aug 2022
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2022 |