THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:24:17 AM
Trottier, Carolyn Edith
CPSO#:
112499
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
110 Victoria Ave
La Verendrye Hospital
Fort Frances ON P9A 2B7
Phone: (807) 274-3261
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Mar 2020 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLYN EDITH TROTTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Aug 2018 to 23 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 09 Mar 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2020 |