THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:08:31 AM
Schenker, Carly Shifra
CPSO#:
112238
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
396 St Clair Ave W
Loblaws on the Mezzanine
Toronto ON M5P 3N3
Phone: (416) 928-9343
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CARLY SHIFRA SCHENKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHENKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2019 |